People Search
Phones, Emails, Addresses, Background check, Web references
All public info
Like other search engines (Google or Bing) Radaris collects information from public sources.
Top Architecture Colleges in India, 2011, List, Best Ranking b.arch colleges, m.arch, aieee rank, nata, schools and institutes in Delhi, Mumbai, Chennai, Pune, Bangalore.
category "b" s.no.aer/2009/455. the result of the following candidates who appeared at the b.com part i (i year)
Top Architecture Colleges in India, 2011, List, Best Ranking b.arch colleges, m.arch, aieee rank, nata, schools and institutes in Delhi, Mumbai, Chennai, Pune, Bangalore.
category "b" s.no.aer/2009/455. the result of the following candidates who appeared at the b.com part i (i year)
Kolkata Area, India - Manager-East BD at Mafoi RandstadView Dhritiman Sengupta's (India) professional profile on LinkedIn. LinkedIn is the world's largest business network, helping professionals like Dhritiman ...
Dhritiman Sengupta. Title: Manager-East BD at Mafoi Randstad; Demographic ...
Dhritiman Sengupta is on Facebook. Join Facebook to connect with Dhritiman Sengupta and others you may know. Facebook gives people the power to share and ...
25 Nov 2010 ... Dhritiman Sengupta-Member news- Mafoi Randstad is a leading Human Resources Service provider in the world having presence across the globe ...
Dhritiman Sengupta India of . View Dhritiman Sengupta Profile , Dhritiman ...
Twitter is without a doubt the best way to share and discover what is happening right now.
View Dhritiman Sengupta's Professional Profile on Brijj.com.Dhritiman Sengupta is currently Branch Manager in Adecco, Kolkata, India.
20 Apr 2008 ... Dhritiman Sengupta said. June 14, 2008 at 1:06 pm. Dear Barun, Thanks a lot for this Blog which gives an opportunity to vent facts, ...
21 Nov 2007 ... Dhritiman Sengupta Says: June 30, 2008 at 2:00 pm. Dear Shrestha, Aren't you settled? ... Dhritiman Sengupta said. June 30, 2008 at 9:48 pm ...
Linkedin
Adecco (Public Company; ADEN; Staffing and Recruiting industry): Branch Manager, (January 2007-August 2010)