People Search
Phones, Emails, Addresses, Background check, Web references
All public info
Like other search engines (Google or Bing) Radaris collects information from public sources.
L.K. Jha Memorial Lectures The Reserve Bank of India has instituted a lecture series in memory of late Shri L.K. Jha, who was Governor of the Reserve Bank of India from ...
Sh. L.K.Jha took over as the Governor of J&K State on July 3, 1973 and continued till February 26, 1981. He also remained Indian Ambassador in United States of ...
Among the other officials suspended are Project Engineers namely LK Gupta, LK Jha and DB Malik, VK Jain (Accounts Officer), CP Singh (DCEO), Jaiprakash Singh(ADM), Dev Pujari (Area ...
Sure, Chelliah was helped by the fact that about two decades earlier, he had been a member of the LK Jha Indirect Taxes Enquiry Committee that gave its report in 1978.
... by the empowered committee of state finance ministers to bring all states within the new Vat regime, finally concluded almost three decades after it was first mooted by the LK Jha ...
L.K. Jha Memorial Lectures The Reserve Bank of India has instituted a lecture series in memory of late Shri L.K. Jha, who was Governor of the Reserve Bank of ...
Sh. L.K.Jha took over as the Governor of J&K State on July 3, 1973 and continued till February 26, 1981. He also remained Indian Ambassador in United ...
Among the other officials suspended are Project Engineers namely LK Gupta, LK Jha and DB Malik, VK Jain (Accounts Officer), CP Singh (DCEO), Jaiprakash Singh(ADM), Dev ...
Lakshmi Kant Jha (22 November 1913 - 16 January 1988), or L. K. Jha as ... The RBI instituted the L.K. Jha Memorial Lectures in commemoration of his memory. ...
L.K. Jha played a crucial role in giving shape to the country's economic policies for nearly four decades. With his fine blend of theory and practice and ...
6 Sep 2003 ... L K Jha, a member of the Indian Civil Service, ...
Thematic Gallery of Indian Autographs - A unique and thematic gallery of Praful Thakkar, an ardent collector of autographs and numismatic and ...
IT IS TO BE NOTED THAT 10 RS NOTE OF L.K.JHA IS AVAILABLE WITH GANDHIJI ON BACK SIDE,BUT THIS BOAT ON BACK SIDE NOTE . IS NOT EASILY - Art - Collectibles ...
Sh. L.K.Jha took over as the Governor of J&K State on July 3, 1973 and continued till February 26, 1981. He also remained Indian Ambassador in United States ...
Nephrologist LK Jha is one of the most experienced and renowned Nephrologist in Noida, Ghaziabad & New Delhi. Contact him to get best Nephrology solution.
Welcome to the Facebook Community Page about L. K. Jha, a collection of shared knowledge concerning L. K. Jha.
L.K.JHA. 1960-1964. FINANCE SECRETARY. 5. ONE RUPEE DESCRIPTION. OBVERSE:- * PICTURE - Ashoka Pillar Capital in rupee coin * LEGEND - Secretary Ministry of ...
Linkedin