People Search
Phones, Emails, Addresses, Background check, Web references
All public info
Like other search engines (Google or Bing) Radaris collects information from public sources.
Mr Pandurang Parab, president of North Goa Zilla Panchayat, Ms Supriya Mahale, former ZP member, Mr Rocky Fernandes, sarpanch, Mr Suryakant Toraskar, Mr Dasharath and Ms Vinaya ...
Mr Pandurang Parab, president of North Goa Zilla Panchayat, Ms Supriya Mahale, former ZP member, Mr Rocky Fernandes, sarpanch, Mr Suryakant Toraskar, Mr Dasharath and Ms ...
Mumbai Area, India - Prof. at PCT College of EngineeringView Suryakant Toraskar's professional profile on LinkedIn. LinkedIn is the world's largest business network, helping professionals like Suryakant Toraskar ...
View smtoraskar7844's profile on Scribd. See smtoraskar7844's documents, reading history, and more.
8 posts - 5 authorsSuryakant Toraskar May 17, 2000 at 03:57:51 Pacific .... Suryakant Toraskar May 22, 2000 at 05:25:59 Pacific ...
25 Nov 2009 ... Suryakant Toraskar's Public Profile on Plaxo. Plaxo helps members like Suryakant Toraskar keep in touch with the people who really matter, ...
The best news, videos and pictures on the web as voted on by the Digg community. Breaking news on Technology, Politics, Entertainment, and more!
Researcher » Suryakant Toraskar, PCT's College of Engineering, Computer Engineering, India, Computer engineering, Computer sciences, Control systems ...
1 post - 1 author - Last post: 7 Oct 2008Re: Are there anyone who interest in modem&pic connection? Posted by Suryakant Toraskar on 22 Oct 2000 at 12:42 AM. : I want to meet him/her<br> ...
13 Jan 2011... Mr Carmel Fernandes, Mr Gopi Halarnkar, Ms Maneka Naik, Mr Govind Sawant, Mr Murari Parab, Mr Aba Talkatkar and Mr Suryakant Toraskar. ...
10 Dec 2010... president of North Goa Zilla Panchayat, Ms Supriya Mahale, former ZP member, Mr Rocky Fernandes, sarpanch, Mr Suryakant Toraskar, ...
Linkedin
Choudhary International / ACe Technosoft (Education Management industry): Software Engineer Systems Division, (1998-2001)
NYSS College of engineering (Education Managemen...